Global Patent Index - EP 1106556 A3

EP 1106556 A3 2002-12-18 - Apparatus for pivoting the bobbin cradle of a textil machine

Title (en)

Apparatus for pivoting the bobbin cradle of a textil machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schwenken eines Spulenrahmens einer Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire pivoter l'étrier support de bobine d'une machine textile

Publication

EP 1106556 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00122346 A

Priority

DE 19959195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2001192172A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To improve for rotating a package frame of textile machinery. SOLUTION: In this apparatus for rotating the package frame, the package frame 2 is secured to a shaft 5 disposed on an axis of rotation, a lift device 9 is provided with a lever 10 secured and coupled the shaft 5 not to be twisted, a rocking element 12 supported on the shaft 5 can be connected with alternations of the shaft 5 and a stationary holding element 21, when the rocking element 12 is connected to the shaft 5, potential energy is accumulated in a pressure accumulator, and the potential energy is released at the time of switching to the connection to the holding element 21, whereby the lever 10 secured and coupled to the shaft 5 not to be twisted is suddenly moved toward the rocking element 12 positioned in the holding element 21 to turn the shaft 5.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/52; B65H 63/036

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/52 (2006.01); B65H 63/036 (2006.01); D01H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/52 (2013.01); B65H 63/0364 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106556 A2 20010613; EP 1106556 A3 20021218; DE 19959195 A1 20010613; JP 2001192172 A 20010717; US 6405967 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI