Global Patent Index - EP 1106557 A3

EP 1106557 A3 2002-09-18 - Bobbin winding machine and method for controlling the winding machine

Title (en)

Bobbin winding machine and method for controlling the winding machine

Title (de)

Aufspulmaschine und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Aufspulmaschine

Title (fr)

Bobinoir et procédé pour la commande de l'embobinage

Publication

EP 1106557 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00125304 A

Priority

DE 19959382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106557A2] A bobbin wind-up machine (1) takes up a feed of a synthetic thread (5). The machine has several motor (8,14) driven rotating components (2,9) whose movement is regulated by a control system (17). The control system incorporates programmable logic control (17) (PLC) components (19) which also have a data read-out display or record.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/70; G05B 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 54/70 (2006.01); D01D 5/08 (2006.01); D01D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2013.01); B65H 2402/61 (2013.01); B65H 2557/65 (2013.01); B65H 2557/652 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106557 A2 20010613; EP 1106557 A3 20020918; EP 1106557 B1 20040519; CN 1195665 C 20050406; CN 1298833 A 20010613; JP 2001206632 A 20010731; KR 20010062268 A 20010707; TW 474889 B 20020201; US 6513749 B1 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAURER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-08-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006476 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 54/70 A, 7G 05B 19/12 B

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, KARSTEN

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPAHLINGER, JOERG

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAGENER, MARTIN

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI