Global Patent Index - EP 1106711 A9

EP 1106711 A9 2002-11-20 - Method for recovery of aqueous wash in phosphate chemical conversion and apparatus for metal surface treatment

Title (en)

Method for recovery of aqueous wash in phosphate chemical conversion and apparatus for metal surface treatment

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Wasserspüllösungen der Herstellung von Phosphatkonversionsüberzügen und Einrichtung zur Metalloberflächenbehandlung

Title (fr)

Procédé de récupération de solutions aqueuses de lavage dans la production de couches de conversion au phosphate et appareil de traitement de surfaces métalliques

Publication

EP 1106711 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00403454 A

Priority

JP 35052499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106711A2] This invention is related to a method for recovery of aqueous wash in a phosphate chemical conversion of a shaped metal product involving carrying out chemical conversion and subsequent cleaning with water, wherein said cleaning with water is performed in one or more stages and comprises a step of withdrawing aqueous wash from a first cleaning stage and adjusting the pH of the wash with at least one acid selected from the group consisting of phosphoric acid, nitric acid, hydrofluoric acid, hydrosilicofluoric acid and fluoroboric acid, a step of treating said pH-adjusted aqueous wash with a first reverse osmosis membrane to separate it into a first filtrate and a first concentrate, and a step of neutralizing said first filtrate with an alkali and treating the alkali-neutralized filtrate with a second reverse osmosis membrane to separate it into a second filtrate and a second concentrate, said first concentrate being recycled for said phosphate chemical conversion, said second filtrate being recycled as aqueous wash for said aqueous cleaning, and said second concentrate being discarded from the system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/86; B01D 61/02; B01D 61/04; C02F 1/44; C23C 22/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/82 (2006.01); C23C 22/00 (2006.01); C23C 22/07 (2006.01); C23C 22/86 (2006.01); C23G 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/86 (2013.01); C23C 22/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106711 A2 20010613; EP 1106711 A3 20020717; EP 1106711 A9 20021120; EP 1106711 B1 20040414; CA 2328039 A1 20010609; CA 2328039 C 20080429; CN 1184350 C 20050112; CN 1309193 A 20010822; DE 60009841 D1 20040519; DE 60009841 T2 20050331; JP 2001164389 A 20010619; JP 3742264 B2 20060201; KR 100738270 B1 20070712; KR 20010062232 A 20010707; US 2001017282 A1 20010830; US 6391206 B2 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071208

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071208

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071208

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009841 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIROSHI, CHIHARA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEIICHIRO, SHIRAHATA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SYOJI, SHIRAISHI

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAOKI, TADA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOSHIYUKI, KAWASHIMA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIDEAKI, MORITA

2002-11-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YUTAKA, OHASHI

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIROSHI, CHIHARA

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEHCHIRO, SHIRAHATA

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SYOJI, SHIRAISHI

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAOKI, TADA

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOSHIYUKI, KAWASHIMA

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIDEAKI, MORITA

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YUTAKA, OHASHI

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 23C 22/86 A, 7C 23C 22/00 B, 7C 02F 1/44 B, 7B 01D 61/04 B, 7B 01D 61/02 B

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI