Global Patent Index - EP 1106735 A3

EP 1106735 A3 2002-11-06 - Method of constructing a fuel resistant road surface

Title (en)

Method of constructing a fuel resistant road surface

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erstellung einer kraftstoffresistenten Fahrbahndecke

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la construction d'un revêtement routier résistant au carburant

Publication

EP 1106735 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00126135 A

Priority

DE 19957657 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106735A2] The method for producing fuel resistant covers on existing driveways involves applying a separating fiber layer, covering this layer with cast asphalt which is at least 2 cm thick and has a specified composition, and filling the joints with a fuel resistant sealing compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 7/18; E01C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 7/18 (2006.01); E01C 7/26 (2006.01); E01C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 7/18 (2013.01); E01C 7/185 (2013.01); E01C 7/26 (2013.01); E01C 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106735 A2 20010613; EP 1106735 A3 20021106; DE 19957657 C1 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ESB-KIRCHHOFF GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI