Global Patent Index - EP 1106759 A3

EP 1106759 A3 2002-09-11 - Anti panic bar

Title (en)

Anti panic bar

Title (de)

Antipanikstange

Title (fr)

Barre anti-panique

Publication

EP 1106759 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00125369 A

Priority

IT BO990140 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1106759A2] A panic bar comprising: an elongated box-like body (2), which is constituted by a profile having a substantially U-shaped cross-section; two levers (114, 14), which are articulated in the box-like body in contrast with elastic return means (120, 20) and are connected like an articulated parallelogram, one (120) of the levers being operatively connected to a closure lock (35); a bar (37), which is accommodated in the box-like body (2) and is rigidly coupled to the pair of levers (120, 20) so as to be movable, parallel to itself, between a position in which it protrudes from the box-like body and a position in which it is substantially internal to the box-like body; the panic bar comprising, at the opposite end with respect to the lock (35), a first element (45) for closing the bar (37) and a second closure element (30) for the box-like body (2), the second element (30) having such a height as to not protrude beyond the bar when the bar is inside the box-like body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1106759 A2 20010613; EP 1106759 A3 20020911; IT 247521 Y1 20020822; IT BO990140 U1 20010611

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CISA S.P.A.

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI