Global Patent Index - EP 1107200 A3

EP 1107200 A3 2003-06-25 - Automatic beverage vending apparatus with improved stick dispenser

Title (en)

Automatic beverage vending apparatus with improved stick dispenser

Title (de)

Getränkeverkaufsautomat mit verbessertem Rührstabausgeber

Title (fr)

Machine de vente de boissons avec distributeur amélioré de bâtonnets

Publication

EP 1107200 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00124486 A

Priority

IT PN990087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1107200A2] Automatic beverage vending apparatus comprising a dispenser of the sticks used to mix the beverages in the cups. The stick dispenser is formed by two columns (11, 12) joined to each other in a side-by-side arrangement, which are controlled by actuating means (18-24) so as to bring the respective stick dispensing outlet in correspondence of a pull-out unit (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/12; G07F 11/22; G07F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/12 (2006.01); G07F 11/22 (2006.01); G07F 11/72 (2006.01); G07F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/12 (2013.01); G07F 11/22 (2013.01); G07F 11/72 (2013.01); G07F 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1107200 A2 20010613; EP 1107200 A3 20030625; IT 1311721 B1 20020319; IT PN990087 A1 20010604; IT PN990087 D0 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI