Global Patent Index - EP 1107208 A3

EP 1107208 A3 2002-11-20 - Method and apparatus for collecting information from multiple vehicles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for collecting information from multiple vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sammlung von Informationen aus mehreren Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la collecte d'information de plusieurs véhicules

Publication

EP 1107208 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00310310 A

Priority

US 45178599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1107208A2] The invention relates to a method and an apparatus for collecting remote data in a mobile vehicle. The method comprises the steps of a first vehicle (10) receiving selected information from a resource data system (ISP). A second vehicle (12) identifies needed information which it lacks and which may potentially be available from the first vehicle (10). The second vehicle (12) transmits an information request via a wireless communication system to the first vehicle (10) requesting the needed information and the first vehicle (10) transmits the needed information to the second vehicle (12) if the needed information is available within the selected information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/02; G01C 21/26; G08G 1/123

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1107208 A2 20010613; EP 1107208 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-09-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08C 17/02 A, 7G 01C 21/26 B, 7G 08G 1/123 B

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI