Global Patent Index - EP 1107821 B1

EP 1107821 B1 2003-06-04 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR COMBINING DISSIMILAR STREAMS

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR COMBINING DISSIMILAR STREAMS

Title (de)

ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM KOMBINIEREN VON UNGLEICHEN STRAHLEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET METHODE PERMETTANT DE COMBINER DES FLUX DISSEMBLABLES

Publication

EP 1107821 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944606 A

Priority

US 9817967 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0012202A1] An arrangement and method for effectively mixing two (or more) streams (G1, G2) of dissimilar materials is disclosed. The streams (G1, G2) may comprise two air streams of different temperatures or humidities, two streams of different gaseous materials, or even two streams of different liquids. The arrangement comprises a baffle structure (12) located within the enclosure through which is passing a first stream (G1) of material. A second stream (G2) is then injected into the enclosure at a location downstream from the baffle (12). In practicing the method of the present invention, the passage of the first stream (G1) of material across the baffle (12) results in creating a low pressure region (28) between the baffle (12) and the input port (56) of the second stream (G2). The second stream (G2) then has a natural tendency to enter this low pressure area, thus increasing the mixing efficiency with the first stream (G1) of material. The baffle (12) may comprise a tapered geometry, and multiple sets of baffles and associated input ports may be used to combine multiple streams of materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/02; B01F 5/04; F26B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/22 (2006.01); B01F 3/02 (2006.01); B01F 5/02 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01); F26B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/02 (2013.01); B01F 5/0408 (2013.01); B01F 5/0473 (2013.01); B01F 5/0616 (2013.01); F26B 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0012202 A1 20000309; AR 020352 A1 20020508; AU 746491 B2 20020502; AU 9211298 A 20000321; BR 9815994 A 20011016; CN 1105595 C 20030416; CN 1314824 A 20010926; CO 4960669 A1 20000925; DE 69815403 D1 20030710; EP 1107821 A1 20010620; EP 1107821 B1 20030604; JP 2002523228 A 20020730; SV 1999000142 A 20000706; TW 457123 B 20011001

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100828

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815403 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR COMBINING DISSIMILAR STREAMS

2002-10-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR COMBINING DISSIMILAR STREAMS

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB