Global Patent Index - EP 1107908 B1

EP 1107908 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A POWER-SHIFT MULTI-SPEED BOAT TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A POWER-SHIFT MULTI-SPEED BOAT TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LASTSCHALTBAREN MEHRGANG-SCHIFFSGETRIEBES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE BOITE DE VITESSES DE BATEAU COMMUTABLE SOUS CHARGE

Publication

EP 1107908 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99944551 A

Priority

  • DE 19840082 A
  • EP 9906355 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840082A1] According to the method for controlling at least one power-shift multi-speed boat transmission in conjunction with a fixed propeller or water jet, the upshift speed is a function of a value which indicates the intended acceleration, especially a function of the regulating speed of the control lever or the speed of modification of the transmission input speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/00 (2006.01); B63H 23/02 (2006.01); F16H 61/02 (2006.01); F16H 61/10 (2006.01); F16H 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/02 (2013.01); Y10T 477/688 (2013.01); Y10T 477/692 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840082 A1 20000309; EP 1107908 A1 20010620; EP 1107908 B1 20021127; JP 2002524341 A 20020806; US 6478715 B1 20021112; WO 0013969 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080828

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080828

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080828

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1107908E

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903572 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE