Global Patent Index - EP 1108189 B1

EP 1108189 B1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR CLEANING A COOKING APPLIANCE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CLEANING A COOKING APPLIANCE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINES GARGERÄTS SOWIE DAZU VERWENDETE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE D'UN APPAREIL DE CUISSON ET DISPOSITIF UTILISE A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 1108189 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939363 A

Priority

  • DE 9901784 W
  • DE 19838864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19838864A1] The invention relates to a method for cleaning a cooking appliance having a cooking compartment. At least one spray nozzle is positioned in said cooking compartment and can be made to rotate therein. The pivot point of the rotating movement is cyclically moved through the cooking compartment. The invention further relates to a device for carrying out such a method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 14/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 14/005 (2013.01); B05B 3/06 (2013.01); B05B 7/32 (2013.01); B05B 13/0405 (2013.01); B05B 15/65 (2018.02); B08B 3/02 (2013.01); B08B 9/0813 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838864 A1 20000309; DE 19838864 C2 20011213; EP 1108189 A1 20010620; EP 1108189 B1 20020918; JP 2002523723 A 20020730; JP 3704472 B2 20051012; US 6478034 B1 20021112; WO 0012942 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-13 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59902784

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140616

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090616

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902784 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT