Global Patent Index - EP 1108190 B1

EP 1108190 B1 2002-11-20 - PIPE OR PIPE SYSTEM FOR PIPELINE MANIFOLDS, HEATING CIRCUIT MANIFOLDS, BOILER MANIFOLDS AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

PIPE OR PIPE SYSTEM FOR PIPELINE MANIFOLDS, HEATING CIRCUIT MANIFOLDS, BOILER MANIFOLDS AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

ROHR BZW. ROHRSYSTEM FÜR ROHRLEITUNGSVERTEILER, HEIZKREISVERTEILER, KESSELVERTEILER UND DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

TUBE OU SYSTEME TUBULAIRE POUR COLLECTEURS DE CANALISATIONS, DE CIRCUITS DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE CHAUDIERES

Publication

EP 1108190 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99950521 A

Priority

  • DE 19837023 A
  • DE 19937851 A
  • EP 9905966 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0009953A1] The invention relates to a pipe or pipe system for use in so-called pipeline manifolds, heating circuit manifolds, boiler manifolds or similar devices while using pipes having a circular to elliptical or lenticular cross section. At least one dome-like cross section expansion is provided which gives the pipe a partially flat upper surface. This dome-like expansion is open in a circular manner, is provided with a collar in the interior of the pipe, and is optionally provided with an inner threading. A branch pipe comprising an outer threading and an outer beading can be screwed into the inner threading in a sealing manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0009953 A1 20000224; AT 228227 T 20021215; DE 29924006 U1 20010830; EP 1108190 A1 20010620; EP 1108190 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903483

- Representative's name: FUERST, SIEGFRIED, DIPL.-ING., DE

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903483

- Representative's name: KANZLEI "REGION GOEPPINGEN" (GBR) PATENTANWALT, DE

2015-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903483

- Representative's name: FUERST, SIEGFRIED, DIPL.-ING., DE

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STRAUB, HANS

- Free text: STRAUB, HANS#GEISSBUEHL 18#73337 BAD UEBERKINGEN-OBERBOEHRINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STRAUB, HANS#GEISSBUEHL 18#73337 BAD UEBERKINGEN-OBERBOEHRINGEN (DE)

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STRAUB HANS

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1108190E

2003-08-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903483 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228227 T 20021215

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STRAUB, HANS

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STRAUB, HANS

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE