Global Patent Index - EP 1108645 A3

EP 1108645 A3 2002-09-25 - Steering arrangement for watercraft

Title (en)

Steering arrangement for watercraft

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Fahrtrichtung eines Wasserfahreugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour gouverner des embarcations

Publication

EP 1108645 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00127197 A

Priority

DE 19960577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1108645A2] The device has a drive with a flow dynamic gondola-like underwater housing (2) outside the vehicle's (1) body, attached to it by a shaft with a drive shaft protruding from at least one end, rotatably mounted in the housing and carrying an external propeller. The direction of travel is altered without altering the housing position using an arrangement (8,9) that acts on the water flowing (5) around it with a fluid forced out of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 25/42; B63H 5/125; B63H 25/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/42 (2006.01); B63H 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/48 (2013.01); B63H 25/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1108645 A2 20010620; EP 1108645 A3 20020925; DE 19960577 A1 20010621; US 2002016111 A1 20020207; US 6413128 B2 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040826

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI