Global Patent Index - EP 1108668 A3

EP 1108668 A3 2002-09-11 - Method of intermediate storing documents and device for carrying out such a method

Title (en)

Method of intermediate storing documents and device for carrying out such a method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Zwischenspeichern von Dokumenten sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung eines solchen Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le stockage intermédiaire de documents et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1108668 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00126396 A

Priority

DE 19961179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1108668A2] A first document set (93) on continuously driven leading belts (69/70) passes through an insertion slot (98) between guide pulleys (62/75, 64/83) of undriven trailing transport belts (45/46). A light barrier (89) operates a carriage to return a distance (a) equal to half the length of the document (DL) and subsequent document sets (95, 97) are deposited overlapping the first document set. When required, the trailing transport belts are driven to remove a document set. An Independent claim is also included for an intermediate storage system to implement an intermediate storage method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/34; B65H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 5/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 5/34 (2006.01); B65H 83/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/24 (2013.01); B65H 5/023 (2013.01); B65H 5/34 (2013.01); B65H 29/6609 (2013.01); B65H 29/6645 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44316 (2013.01); B65H 2404/254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1108668 A2 20010620; EP 1108668 A3 20020911; DE 19961179 A1 20010628; JP 2001213579 A 20010807; US 2001004142 A1 20010621; US 6508464 B2 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 5/34 A, 7B 65H 5/02 B

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI