Global Patent Index - EP 1108772 A3

EP 1108772 A3 2002-09-18 - Rare earth phosphate, its production process and rare earth phosphate phosphor

Title (en)

Rare earth phosphate, its production process and rare earth phosphate phosphor

Title (de)

Seltenerdephosphate, Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben und Seltenerdephosphate-Phosphor

Title (fr)

Phosphate de terre rare, son procédé de préparation et phosphate de terre rare luminophore

Publication

EP 1108772 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00126970 A

Priority

JP 35767599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1108772A2] A rare earth phosphate which has a compositional formula of LnxCeyTbzPO4 wherein Ln is at least one element selected from the group consisting of La, Gd and Y, and x, y and z are numbers which satisfy 0</=x<1, 0</=y</=1, 0</=z</=0.4 and x+y+z=1, and which has a powder reflectance after calcination at a temperature of from 120 to 900 DEG C in the air, of at least 99% of the reflectance of a MgO powder at a wavelength of 490 nm, its production process, a phosphor using said rare earth phosphate and its production process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 11/81

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 25/26 (2006.01); C09K 11/77 (2006.01); C09K 11/81 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/7752 (2013.01); C09K 11/7709 (2013.01); C09K 11/7723 (2013.01); C09K 11/7777 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1108772 A2 20010620; EP 1108772 A3 20020918; CN 1303814 A 20010718; JP 2001172627 A 20010626; JP 4219514 B2 20090204

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041220

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI