Global Patent Index - EP 1109033 A8

EP 1109033 A8 2001-12-05 - GPS RECEIVER, POSITION CAPTURE SYSTEM AND POSITION DETERMINATION

Title (en)

GPS RECEIVER, POSITION CAPTURE SYSTEM AND POSITION DETERMINATION

Title (de)

GPS EMPFAENGER, POSITIONSFANGSYSTEM UND POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR GPS, SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE POSITION ET DETERMINATION DE POSITION

Publication

EP 1109033 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 99925347 A

Priority

JP 9903219 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109033A1] When a 2-dimensional positioning or 3-dimensional positioning cannot be completed within a predetermined period of time, all currently seized satellites are cancelled and a stored almanac is referred to in order to resume attempts to seize satellites. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 5/14; G01C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 1/00 (2006.01); G01S 19/28 (2010.01); G01S 19/34 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 19/34 (2013.01); G01S 19/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109033 A1 20010620; EP 1109033 A4 20060614; EP 1109033 A8 20011205; US 2001005811 A1 20010628; US 6452545 B2 20020917; WO 0077538 A1 20001221

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-06-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE