Global Patent Index - EP 1109174 A3

EP 1109174 A3 2002-09-18 - Shielded flat cable, manufacturing method therefor and machining apparatus therefor

Title (en)

Shielded flat cable, manufacturing method therefor and machining apparatus therefor

Title (de)

Abgeschirmtes Flachkabel, sein Herstellungsverfahren und Bearbeitungsmaschine dafür

Title (fr)

Câble plat blindé, sa méthode de fabrication et son appareil d'usinage

Publication

EP 1109174 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00127355 A

Priority

JP 35428299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109174A2] A flat cable 10 is constituted by integrally forming a shield 20 and an external sheath 24 with a plurality of core wires 12 and 18. Then, a slit S for branching each of the core wires 12 and 18 is formed at a terminal of the flat cable 10. Further, a coupling portion 26 is formed at a part P in which this slit S is formed. The coupling portion 26 is a means for mechanically coupling the shield 20 thereto. Preferably, the coupling portion 26 is constituted by an external sheath 24 for riveting the shield 20 thereto by penetrating the shield 20 and then connecting the shield 20 thereto. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/08 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0861 (2013.01); H01R 12/594 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109174 A2 20010620; EP 1109174 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040927

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SHIELDED FLAT CABLE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND MACHINING APPARATUS THEREFOR

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI