Global Patent Index - EP 1109245 A3

EP 1109245 A3 2002-09-04 - Antenna for the transmission and reception of electromagnetic signals

Title (en)

Antenna for the transmission and reception of electromagnetic signals

Title (de)

Antenne zur Abstrahlung und zum Empfang elektromagnetischer Wellen

Title (fr)

Antenne pour la transmission et la réception de signaux électromagnétiques

Publication

EP 1109245 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00403190 A

Priority

DE 19961237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109245A2] The antenna has a parabolic reflector, a stimulator acting as a sub-reflector and a radio box on the rear of the reflector connected via a hollow conductor to a transmitter/receiver. A polarization switch (8) arranged between the radio box and hollow conductor for simultaneous transmission of two orthogonal linearly polarized waves has two hollow conductor paths (9,10), one straight and one with a 90 degree bend.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/161; H01Q 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/161 (2006.01); H01Q 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/0258 (2013.01); H01P 1/161 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0905813 A2 19990331 - CIT ALCATEL [FR]
  • [A] DE 3822981 A1 19881222 - KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]
  • [Y] JUNGK K: "DAS SPEISESYSTEM", FUNKSCHAU, FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, DE, vol. 67, no. 7, 17 March 1995 (1995-03-17), pages 71 - 72, XP000498129, ISSN: 0016-2841
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 405 (E - 1122) 16 October 1991 (1991-10-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109245 A2 20010620; EP 1109245 A3 20020904; AU 5662700 A 20010621; BR 0005897 A 20010717; DE 19961237 A1 20010621; US 6384796 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI