Global Patent Index - EP 1109259 A3

EP 1109259 A3 2003-06-25 - Electrical connector for circuit board

Title (en)

Electrical connector for circuit board

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder für Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique pour carte de circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 1109259 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00126378 A

Priority

DE 19960856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109259A2] A contact structure comprises contactors made of conductive material, each comprising an intermediate portion inserted in a through hole of a substrate. A spring portion is provided and exerts a resilient contact force when the contactor is pressed against the contact target. A contact structure comprises a substrate (20) having through holes running through upper and lower surfaces; and contactors (30) made of conductive material and are mounted on the substrate. Each contactor comprises an intermediate portion inserted in the through hole. A contact portion is connected to the intermediate portion and positioned at one end of the contactor. A base portion is provided at the other end of the contactor. A spring portion is provided between the base portion and the intermediate portion. It has a cantilever shape and is inclined to the substrate. It exerts a resilient contact force when the contactor is pressed against the contact target (300). Independent claims are also included for the following: (A) the production of a contact structure comprising forming a sacrificial layer on a silicon substrate; forming a photoresist layer on the sacrificial layer; aligning a photomask over the photoresist layer and exposing the photoresist layer with ultraviolet light; developing image pattern of the contactors on the photoresist layer; forming the contactors on the photoresist layer; stripping off the photoresist layer; removing the sacrificial layer to separate the contactors from the silicon substrate; and mounting the contactors on a substrate, so that at least one end of the contactors functions as a contact pad (320); and (B) a probe contact comprising a contact substrate having contactors, a probe card for mounting the contact substrate, and a pin block having contact pins interfacing between the probe card and a semiconductor test system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/20; H01R 12/22; H01R 13/193; H01R 13/24; H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/55 (2011.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01); H05K 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0263 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01); H01R 43/0256 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109259 A2 20010620; EP 1109259 A3 20030625; EP 1109259 B1 20040929; CA 2328327 A1 20010616; CA 2328327 C 20050607; CN 1129206 C 20031126; CN 1300116 A 20010620; DE 19960856 A1 20010628; US 2001004555 A1 20010621; US 6530787 B2 20030311

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121203

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007981 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARTING, DIETMAR, DIPL.-KFM.

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PAPE, GUENTER, DIPL.-ING.

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERGHORN, MANFRED, DIPL.-ING.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 12/20 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 12/22 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/24 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/193 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/646 B

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI