Global Patent Index - EP 1109264 A3

EP 1109264 A3 2004-12-08 - Terminal protector for multipolar electrical devices

Title (en)

Terminal protector for multipolar electrical devices

Title (de)

Schutzeinrichtung für Kontakte multipolarer elektrischer Geräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection des terminaux de dispositifs électriques multipolaires

Publication

EP 1109264 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00311158 A

Priority

ES 9902728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109264A2] A terminal protector for multipolar electrical devices includes connecting terminals provided with screws that can be driven through respective holes (1) in the frame of the corresponding apparatus (3). A sheet (4) of insulating material is inserted in a groove (5) defined by the frame of the corresponding apparatus (3) in the zone of application terminals, the sheet (4) being provided with openings that match the arrangement of the access holes (1) to the screws of the connecting terminals. Adjacent to those openings (6) the respective blind zones (7) are defined in the same distribution as the access holes (1) to the screws (2) of the connecting terminals. The sheet (4) is capable of a sliding motion between the position in which the openings (6) match the access holes (1) to the terminal screws and another position in which the blind zones (7) close off the access holes (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/453 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4534 (2013.01); H01H 9/0264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109264 A2 20010620; EP 1109264 A3 20041208; EP 1109264 B1 20070307; DE 60033770 D1 20070419; DE 60033770 T2 20071206; ES 2160532 A1 20011101; ES 2160532 B2 20030501; ES 2280178 T3 20070916; HU 0004952 A2 20020328; HU 0004952 A3 20030728; HU 0004952 D0 20010228; HU 223169 B1 20040329; PL 201363 B1 20090430; PL 344541 A1 20010618

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20170710

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2280178 T3

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033770 P 20070419

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI