Global Patent Index - EP 1109270 A3

EP 1109270 A3 2002-12-18 - Socket-outlet for lighting fixture

Title (en)

Socket-outlet for lighting fixture

Title (de)

Steckdose für eine Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Prise de courant pour un dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 1109270 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00660227 A

Priority

FI 992685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109270A2] The present invention relates to a socket-outlet for lighting fixtures, the socket-outlet comprising a body (4, 6, 11) and a female connector (1) arranged to the body, the connector comprising conductor joints (2) for receiving electric wires and female coupling elements (3) for providing a contact between the conductor joints and the coupling elements of a male connector. To allow a more versatile socket-outlet than before to be provided, the female connector (1) in question is in the form of a part which is separate from the body and which is provided with fastening members (9) for fastening the female connector (1) to fastening members (10) arranged to the body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/502; F21V 21/03; H02G 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/03 (2006.01); F21V 21/112 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); H01R 33/08 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/03 (2013.01); F21V 21/112 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01); H01R 33/0872 (2013.01); H01R 13/6395 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109270 A2 20010620; EP 1109270 A3 20021218; NO 20006362 A 20010615; NO 20006362 D0 20001213

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/502 A, 7H 02G 3/08 B, 7F 21V 21/03 B

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI