Global Patent Index - EP 1109634 B1

EP 1109634 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR MINIMIZING THICKENED ENDS DURING THE ROLLING OF PIPES IN A STRETCH REDUCING MILL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MINIMIZING THICKENED ENDS DURING THE ROLLING OF PIPES IN A STRETCH REDUCING MILL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG VERDICKTER ENDEN BEIM WALZEN VON ROHREN IN EINEM STRECKREDUZIERWALZWERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DES EXTREMITES EPAISSIES LORS DU LAMINAGE DE TUYAUX DANS UN LAMINOIR ETIREUR-REDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1109634 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936250 A

Priority

  • DE 9901459 W
  • DE 19840864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840864C1] The invention relates to a method for minimizing thickened ends during the rolling of pipes in a stretch reducing mill. To this end the torque of individually driven mill stands is temporarily modified when the front and back ends of the pipes pass through the stretch reducing mill so that said pipe ends are rolled at roll speed ratios which are greater than the steady-state roll speed ratios. Between the steady-state and the increased speed ratios smaller than steady-state speed ratios are set.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 17/14; B21B 35/02; B21B 37/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/14 (2006.01); B21B 37/18 (2006.01); B21B 37/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/78 (2013.01); B21B 17/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840864 C1 19990729; AT 228400 T 20021215; AU 5147599 A 20000321; CN 1144630 C 20040407; CN 1315887 A 20011003; CZ 20010754 A3 20010912; CZ 300083 B6 20090128; EP 1109634 A1 20010627; EP 1109634 B1 20021127; ES 2183589 T3 20030316; JP 2002523243 A 20020730; JP 3794923 B2 20060712; RU 2224607 C2 20040227; UA 67792 C2 20010917; US 6526792 B1 20030304; WO 0012237 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183589 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228400 T 20021215

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT