Global Patent Index - EP 1109709 B1

EP 1109709 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A TRAFFIC INSTALLATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A TRAFFIC INSTALLATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR DIE STEUERUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG EINER VERKEHRSTECHNISCHEN ANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE ET DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE PREVISION D'ECOULEMENT DU TRAFIC

Publication

EP 1109709 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99928991 A

Priority

  • CH 9900331 W
  • CH 170498 A
  • CH 19499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0010860A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling and monitoring a traffic installation comprising control and monitoring elements, notably switch points (W1, ..., W4), signals (S1, ..., S8) and track non-occupancy indicators (FM1, ..., FM14). By means of a control process based on a track blocking table, which in response to a request for the establishment of a route blocks and controls all setting elements associated with said route such that they are unavailable to other requests for the establishment of other routes and operations, at least two routes for rail vehicles can be set. At least one parameter (1, 2, 3, 4) is assigned to the installation elements (W1, ..., W4; S1, ..., S8; FM1, ..., FM14) which relates to the conditions or assignments to be defined or taken into consideration for each intended route, so that by means of a parameter (1) assigned to the track non-occupancy indicators (FM1, ..., FM14) the track non-occupancy indicator (FM1, ..., FM14) sequence along a route is defined and by means of a further parameter (1) assigned to the other installation elements (W1, ..., W4; S1, ..., S8) the association of said other elements with at least one of the track non-occupancy indicators (FM1, ..., FM14) is defined. As a result of the above parameter assignments the control process based on said assignment permits a simple and safe control of the installation to be controlled. The above control process is further made easier to carry out by the complete and technically executable description of operating conditions. The measures provided for in the invention also permit a more rapid establishment and suppression of travel routes and recognition of disturbances in track non-occupancy indicators.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 5/00; B61L 19/06; B61L 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 19/06 (2006.01); B61L 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 21/10 (2013.01); B61L 19/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0010860 A1 20000302; AT 228451 T 20021215; DE 59903573 D1 20030109; EP 1109709 A1 20010627; EP 1109709 B1 20021127; HU 0103280 A2 20011128; HU 0103280 A3 20030428; HU 223978 B1 20050428; JP 2002523288 A 20020730; JP 3523203 B2 20040426

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131010

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120709

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903573

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228451 T

- Effective date: 20110719

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-13 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903573 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228451 T 20021215

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020304

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010120

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE