Global Patent Index - EP 1109964 B1

EP 1109964 B1 2002-11-27 - STEAM IRON

Title (en)

STEAM IRON

Title (de)

DAMPFBÜGELEISEN

Title (fr)

FER A REPASSER A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 1109964 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99946062 A

Priority

  • DE 29815676 U
  • EP 9906362 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0012807A1] The invention relates to an electrically heated steam iron in which an electric heating body is connected to an iron soleplate (2) in a heat conducting manner. The iron soleplate (2) is provided with a coating or with an additional soleplate on the running surface thereof, said additional soleplate having a comparatively lower heat conductivity. According to the invention, the iron soleplate (2) comprises an enlargement (14) which is made of a material that both conducts and accumulates heat well, and which is situated in the area of the soleplate tip thereof so that no disrupting fall in temperature occurs in the area of the soleplate tip. The enlargement (14) is constructed of two limbs which wrap around a steam labyrinth (7) situated on the upper side of the iron soleplate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/38; D06F 75/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815676 U1 19981105; EP 1109964 A1 20010627; EP 1109964 B1 20021127; ES 2189485 T3 20030701; US 6385873 B1 20020514; WO 0012807 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110829

2013-04-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130404

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903574

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-03-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120301

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100810

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG

- Free text: JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 135#CH-4626 NIEDERBUCHSITEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 135#CH-4626 NIEDERBUCHSITEN (CH)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189485 T3

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903574 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE