Global Patent Index - EP 1109992 B1

EP 1109992 B1 2002-11-20 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR CAMSHAFT SYSTEMS

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR CAMSHAFT SYSTEMS

Title (de)

STEUERTRIEB FÜR NOCKENWELLENANORDNUNGEN

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTEMES D'ARBRES A CAMES

Publication

EP 1109992 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920741 A

Priority

  • DE 19840659 A
  • EP 9902717 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840659A1] The present invention relates to a control device for the camshaft systems of an internal combustion engine comprising n V-shaped cylinder benches. The control device comprises a distribution system with a first distribution gear (14) intermeshing with an output gear (12) mounted on the crankshaft (10) of the internal combustion engine. To this end, the distribution configuration comprises m<n secondary distribution gears (16, 18) that intermesh with the first distribution gear (14) and transmit a driving force to the n camshaft systems (34) of the n cylinder benches through n endless-chain drives (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/02; F02B 75/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/022 (2013.01); F01L 1/02 (2013.01); F02B 75/224 (2013.01); F01L 1/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840659 A1 20000309; CN 1110617 C 20030604; CN 1316034 A 20011003; EP 1109992 A1 20010627; EP 1109992 B1 20021120; US 6378478 B1 20020430; WO 0014387 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-04-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040413

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903486 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT