Global Patent Index - EP 1110002 A4

EP 1110002 A4 2002-11-06 - HAND/FOOT SELECTOR FOR ELECTRONIC CONTROLS ON A SKID STEER LOADER

Title (en)

HAND/FOOT SELECTOR FOR ELECTRONIC CONTROLS ON A SKID STEER LOADER

Title (de)

HAND/FÜSS WÄHLER FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNG EINES RADLADERS

Title (fr)

SELECTIONNEUR MAIN/PIED POUR COMMANDES ELECTRONIQUES SUR UN CHARGEUR A DIRECTION A GLISSEMENT

Publication

EP 1110002 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00937735 A

Priority

  • US 0014318 W
  • US 13693399 P
  • US 32440999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0073666A1] A control system (42) controls actuation of a hydraulic cylinder on a skid steer loader (10). The control system (42) includes a movable element (44, 45), movable by an operator. A position sensor (46, 51) is coupled to the movable element (44, 45) and provides a position signal indicative of a position of the movable element (44, 45). A controller (48) is coupled to the position sensor (46, 51) to receive the position signal and provide a control signal based on the position signal. A valve spool (52) controls flow of hydraulic fluid to the hydraulic cylinder (54). An actuator (50) is coupled to the controller (48) and the valve spool (52) and moves the valve spool (52) in response to the control signal from the controller (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/08; E02F 9/20; G05G 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/20 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 13/043 (2006.01); G05G 9/047 (2006.01); G05G 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/047 (2013.01); E02F 9/2004 (2013.01); G05G 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0073666 A1 20001207; AU 5286900 A 20001218; CA 2338733 A1 20001207; CA 2338733 C 20070522; EP 1110002 A1 20010627; EP 1110002 A4 20021106; JP 2003500615 A 20030107

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-19 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 15B 11/08 A, 7G 05G 11/00 B, 7E 02F 9/20 B

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SAGASER, THOMAS, M.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRANDT, KENNETH, A.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACOBSON, SCOTT, B.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BROCK, KNUTE, K.

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE