Global Patent Index - EP 1110495 A3

EP 1110495 A3 2002-11-13 - Device for a vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Device for a vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für einen Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour un aspirateur

Publication

EP 1110495 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00850215 A

Priority

SE 9904766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110495A2] This invention relates to a device for a vacuum cleaner having a vacuum cleaner housing enclosing a vacuum source and an inlet channel for dust laden air which channel is connected to the vacuum source, the vacuum cleaner being provided with a lid (17) covering a space for accessories, a dust bag, a filter or the like which are stored in the vacuum cleaner housing. The lid (17) is tiltably arranged in the housing such that it in its closed position and when being manually acted on comes into engagement with means (22) controlling one or several functions of the vacuum cleaner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/00; A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0018 (2013.01); A47L 9/2842 (2013.01); A47L 9/2857 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110495 A2 20010627; EP 1110495 A3 20021113; SE 9904766 D0 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI