Global Patent Index - EP 1110688 A3

EP 1110688 A3 2002-11-13 - Vibrating machine

Title (en)

Vibrating machine

Title (de)

Rüttelmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine vibrante

Publication

EP 1110688 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00127915 A

Priority

DE 19962083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110688A2] The machine has a base frame (1) and a vibration generator (6) to vibrate a vibration table (4). A concrete mould (16) for a cast concrete part is set on the vibration table. A vacuum coupling (13) is provided, to couple the concrete mould and the vibration generator, to reduce noise. The vacuum coupling non-positively pulls the vibration table and the concrete mould together during the vibration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/087; B28B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/087 (2006.01); B28B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/0014 (2013.01); B28B 1/0873 (2013.01); B28B 7/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] FR 2527970 A2 19831209 - HUMARBO FRANCE SARL [FR]
  • [X] FR 2147882 A2 19730311 - CERAVER
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 10 31 August 1999 (1999-08-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 368 (M - 647) 2 December 1987 (1987-12-02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110688 A2 20010627; EP 1110688 A3 20021113; DE 19962083 A1 20010705; DE 19962083 C2 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061114

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28B 1/087 A, 7B 28B 7/00 B

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI