Global Patent Index - EP 1110721 B1

EP 1110721 B1 2009-02-11 - Device for changing a rotationally symmetrical body

Title (en)

Device for changing a rotationally symmetrical body

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wechseln eines rotationssymmetrischen Bauteiles

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour remplacer une pièce à symétrie de revolution

Publication

EP 1110721 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00127629 A

Priority

DE 19962425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110721A1] The device includes a drivable controllable handling apparatus (10) fitted with two drivable and controllable grippers (9) for holding and fixing and releasing the ends of a rotationally symmetrical component (5,15) such as a cylinder. The handling apparatus can be controlled at least on a first guide path which runs between a bearing (6) and a bearing position (7) and can be controlled between a second guide path which runs between the bearing (6) and another bearing position (8). the gripper can be formed by a ball support sleeve with at least one ball mounted secured against loss on the circumferential side wherein the or each ball can protrude or be retracted.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0016 (2013.01); B41P 2213/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110721 A1 20010627; EP 1110721 B1 20090211; AT 422419 T 20090215; DE 19962425 A1 20010705; DE 19962425 B4 20040129; DE 50015551 D1 20090326

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 422419 T

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50015551

- Effective date: 20120509

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101216

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101216

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015551 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI