Global Patent Index - EP 1110891 A3

EP 1110891 A3 2002-09-18 - Machine for processing flat printed materials

Title (en)

Machine for processing flat printed materials

Title (de)

Flächige Bedruckstoffe verarbeitende Maschine

Title (fr)

Machine de traitement de matériaux imprimés plats

Publication

EP 1110891 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00124297 A

Priority

DE 19961883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110891A2] The printing machine for sheets has a drive chain and guide rails (6). A damping layer (6.5) is fitted between the rail and a clamp mounted on the frame (4.17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/08 (2006.01); B65G 21/22 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/041 (2013.01); B65H 2402/5171 (2013.01); B65H 2404/342 (2013.01); B65H 2515/82 (2013.01); B65H 2601/521 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110891 A2 20010627; EP 1110891 A3 20020918; DE 10056727 A1 20010621; JP 2001219539 A 20010814; US 2001013290 A1 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI