Global Patent Index - EP 1110896 A3

EP 1110896 A3 2002-09-25 - Method for winding cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Method for winding cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Wickeln von Kreuzspulen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le bobinage de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 1110896 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00122348 A

Priority

DE 19961982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110896A2] The diameter of the bobbin (10) is normally calculated (20) from the speed and diameter of the friction drive drum (13) but during pattern breaking the drum speed is altered momentarily so that slip occurs. To obtain the actual momentary bobbin diameter, the speed value prior to pattern breaking is used to calculate the expected increase in diameter during this period, which is then added on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/38; B65H 63/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/38 (2006.01); B65H 63/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/38 (2013.01); B65H 63/082 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110896 A2 20010627; EP 1110896 A3 20020925; EP 1110896 B1 20050209; AT 288872 T 20050215; DE 19961982 A1 20010705; JP 2001180867 A 20010703; JP 4787404 B2 20111005; US 2001004998 A1 20010628; US 6405965 B2 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009472

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061013

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-10-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009472 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 54/38 A, 7B 65H 63/08 B

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI