Global Patent Index - EP 1110898 A3

EP 1110898 A3 2002-09-25 - Interface in the transportsystem of a textile machine for making cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Interface in the transportsystem of a textile machine for making cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Schnittstelle im Transportsystem einer Kreuzspulen herstellenden Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Interface dans le système de transport d'une machine textile pour fabriquer des bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 1110898 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00125294 A

Priority

  • DE 19962295 A
  • DE 10044632 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1110898A2] The feed station that places ring spinning bobbins on carriers (17) includes a slotted transfer plate (25) for feeding empty bobbin carriers from the return conveyor (14). Centralizing arms (39) ensure that the ring spinning bobbin (19) is placed centrally on the peg of the bobbin carrier. Both the transfer plate (25) and the bobbin centralizing mechanism are driven from the same motor (27). The transfer plate shaft carries a cam (71) that transmits the drive through a link (73) to the centralizing mechanism. The mechanism also has a device for pressing the bobbin down on to the peg of the bobbin carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/04 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/02 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/069 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1110898 A2 20010627; EP 1110898 A3 20020925; CZ 20004788 A3 20010815; JP 2001199636 A 20010724; US 2001004999 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040318

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI