Global Patent Index - EP 1111012 A9

EP 1111012 A9 2001-12-19 - Coating powders comprising macrocyclic oligomers

Title (en)

Coating powders comprising macrocyclic oligomers

Title (de)

Pulverlacke, die makrocyclische Oligomere enthalten

Title (fr)

Poudres de revêtement contenant des oligomères macrocycliques

Publication

EP 1111012 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00310839 A

Priority

  • CA 2351952 A
  • US 46740799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111012A1] A coating powder comprising a macrocyclic oligomer and a ring-opening polymerization agent is applied to an article, fused, and converted to a linear polymer at a temperature of from about 160 to about 400 DEG C. The powder has the low melt viscosity and friability of a thermoset powder but is converted at high fusing temperatures to a tough coating having the good impact resistance and good elongation of a thermoplastic powder. The oligomer is a polyester, polycarbonate, polyamide, polyimide, polyamideimide. The article may be coated electrostatically or in a fluidized bed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 5/03; C09D 167/00; C09D 167/06; C09D 169/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/12 (2006.01); C08F 2/46 (2006.01); C08F 283/01 (2006.01); C08G 63/82 (2006.01); C08G 64/00 (2006.01); C08G 69/00 (2006.01); C08G 73/10 (2006.01); C08G 73/14 (2006.01); C09D 5/00 (2006.01); C09D 5/03 (2006.01); C09D 167/00 (2006.01); C09D 167/06 (2006.01); C09D 169/00 (2006.01); C09D 177/00 (2006.01); C09D 177/02 (2006.01); C09D 177/06 (2006.01); C09D 179/08 (2006.01); C09D 201/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 167/06 (2013.01); C09D 5/03 (2013.01); C09D 167/00 (2013.01); C09D 169/00 (2013.01); C09D 177/00 (2013.01); C09D 177/02 (2013.01); C09D 177/06 (2013.01); C09D 179/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111012 A1 20010627; EP 1111012 A9 20011219; EP 1111012 B1 20050302; CA 2351952 A1 20021227; CA 2351952 C 20050222; JP 2001214133 A 20010807; US 6376026 B1 20020423; US 6414103 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60018373

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101207

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-01-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-06-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018373 P 20050407

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI