Global Patent Index - EP 1111028 A9

EP 1111028 A9 2001-12-19 - Engine oil composition

Title (en)

Engine oil composition

Title (de)

Motorölzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile moteur

Publication

EP 1111028 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00850216 A

Priority

JP 36544599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111028A1] Engine oil compositions comprise (A) a lubricating base oil having a kinematic viscosity at 100 DEG C of 2 to 6 mm<2>/S, a viscosity index of 120 or more, and a total aromatics content of 15 percent by mass or less and (B) a polymethacrylate-based viscosity index improver in such an amount that the composition has a kinematic viscosity at 100 DEG C of 4.0 to 9.3 mm<2>/s. Disclosed are also engine oil compositions which comprise (A) a lubricating base oil having a kinematic viscosity at 100 DEG C of 2 to 6 mm<2>/s, a viscosity index of 120 or more, and a total aromatics content of 15 percent by mass or less; (B) a polymethacrylate-based viscosity index improver in such an amount that the composition has a kinematic viscosity at 100 DEG C of 4.0 to 9.3 mm<2>/s; and (C) molybdenumdithiocarbamate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 161/00 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10N 20/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/044 (2013.01); C10M 101/02 (2013.01); C10M 105/06 (2013.01); C10M 105/36 (2013.01); C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 107/08 (2013.01); C10M 107/10 (2013.01); C10M 135/18 (2013.01); C10M 145/14 (2013.01); C10M 2203/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0265 (2013.01); C10M 2205/028 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2825 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2855 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2220/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/102 (2013.01); C10N 2240/103 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/105 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111028 A1 20010627; EP 1111028 A9 20011219; EP 1111028 B1 20171122; JP 2001181664 A 20010703; US 2001027169 A1 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60049748

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2017-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-07-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170622

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061121

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI