Global Patent Index - EP 1111165 B1

EP 1111165 B1 2003-06-18 - Handle for a motor vehicle wing comprising improved means for operating a switching device

Title (en)

Handle for a motor vehicle wing comprising improved means for operating a switching device

Title (de)

Griff für Kraftfahrzeugflügel mit verbesserten Mitteln zur Betätigung eines Schaltorgans

Title (fr)

Poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens perfectionnés d'actionnement des organes de commutation

Publication

EP 1111165 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403545 A

Priority

FR 9916343 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111165A1] The handle includes a cam (38) and an actuating lever (44) which is rotatably connected and pivotably mounted about an axis (A2) of the support (14) of the handle, parallel to the axis (A1) of the pallet (16). The manipulating pallet has a drive finger (24) which cooperates with the control surface (42) of the cam, in a manner such that, in the unlocking interrogation position, the actuating lever activates the unlocking switch (34) and, in the locking interrogation position, the actuating lever actuates the locking switch (36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 5/00; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/18 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10T 292/82 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111165 A1 20010627; EP 1111165 B1 20030618; DE 60003384 D1 20030724; DE 60003384 T2 20040513; ES 2199753 T3 20040301; FR 2802962 A1 20010629; FR 2802962 B1 20020215; JP 2001193319 A 20010717; US 2001005082 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051216

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051215

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-12-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2004-12-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-12-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-12-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041203

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199753 T3

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003384 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI