Global Patent Index - EP 1111185 B1

EP 1111185 B1 2002-09-18 - Safety device for roller shutters or similar

Title (en)

Safety device for roller shutters or similar

Title (de)

Sicherungseinrichtung für Rolläden oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour volets roulants ou similaire

Publication

EP 1111185 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125844 A

Priority

EP 99125844 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111185A1] The security element (6) which is made of a strip of leaf spring material and connects the reinforced roller shutter (4) to the winding shaft (1) has a bulging channel-like cross-section which when wound up deforms elastically into a flat shape but when the shutter is unwound the security element forms a spring-up element which acts between the contact bearing face (16) and the winding shaft and prevents the shutter from sliding up. The security element is fixed on the shutter and/or shaft side with enough play to allow deformation between the bulging and flat state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/171 (2006.01); E06B 9/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/171 (2013.01); E06B 9/86 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111185 A1 20010627; EP 1111185 B1 20020918; DE 59902785 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101224

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902785

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101224

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100105

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902785 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI