Global Patent Index - EP 1111234 A3

EP 1111234 A3 2002-12-18 - Fuel pump

Title (en)

Fuel pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 1111234 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00127312 A

Priority

DE 19961558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001004441A1] A pump for conveying a liquid has a housing and a shaft rotatably supported in the housing. An eccentric drive is arranged in the housing. At least one drive element is provided and is configured to be driven by the eccentric drive. The shaft is configured to adjust the eccentricity of the eccentric drive. The drive element is configured to be adjusted according to the eccentricity of the eccentric drive by a translatory movement in a direction transverse to the shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 9/04; F04B 1/04; F04B 49/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 9/04 (2006.01); F04B 13/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/125 (2013.01); F04B 1/0413 (2013.01); F04B 9/045 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18056 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2112 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111234 A2 20010627; EP 1111234 A3 20021218; EP 1111234 B1 20060426; DE 19961558 A1 20010621; DE 50012643 D1 20060601; JP 2001193603 A 20010717; US 2001004441 A1 20010621; US 6454544 B2 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101213

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012643

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101213

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101213

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012643 P 20060601

2006-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI