Global Patent Index - EP 1111434 A9

EP 1111434 A9 2001-12-19 - Light beam scanning apparatus

Title (en)

Light beam scanning apparatus

Title (de)

Lichtabtastvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de balayage opto-mecanique

Publication

EP 1111434 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01105468 A

Priority

  • EP 92907344 A
  • JP 6296191 A
  • JP 14020591 A
  • JP 27527191 A
  • JP 27749791 A
  • JP 27749891 A
  • JP 27749991 A
  • JP 27750091 A
  • JP 32016291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0532760A1] An optical beam scanning apparatus of a high resolution, compensates the increase and change of the diameter of a scanning beam, uneven rotation of a hologram rotating body, the positional changes in the directions of main and subscannings by the mode hopping of the wavelength of a semi-conductor laser, and the deterioration of the parallelism of the base of the hologram rotating body, etc., which mar the resolution and impede the cost reduction of a hologram scanner. The apparatus uses only the holograms that are duplicated in large quantities, without using auxiliary optical systems such as optical lenses and mirrors with curvatures. On a rotating body (1) and a fixed plate (2), provided are respectively diffraction gratings (1a, 2a) which minimize the sum of the weighted values of the squared or absolute values of the differences of two light path lengths, the weighting being conducted for each of scanning points on the entire image-forming surface (4). One of the two optical path length is of a light beam on the principal axis (MA), which is diffracted by the diffraction grating (1a) and by the diffraction grating (2a) and then, is focused at a scanning point (k) on the image-forming surface (4); the other is of a light beam on a peripheral axis (MI) different from the principal axis (MA). Alternatively, the diffraction gratings (1a, 2a) minimize the sum of the weighted values of the squared or absolute value of the sum of two phase differences, the weighting being conducted for each of scanning points on the entire image-forming surface (4). One of the two phase differences is the shift of the phase of the diffraction grating (1a) on the rotating body (1) from the principle axis (MA) when the light beam is focused at the scanning point (k); the other is the shift of the phase recorded on the diffraction grating (2a) from the principle axis (MA) when the light beam strikes the stationary plate (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 26/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/32 (2006.01); G02B 26/10 (2006.01); G03H 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/32 (2013.01); G02B 26/106 (2013.01); G03H 1/0005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0532760 A1 19930324; EP 0532760 A4 19950419; EP 0532760 B1 20011128; AU 1213899 A 19990318; AU 1434692 A 19921102; AU 2170195 A 19950914; AU 3238997 A 19971009; AU 3239297 A 19971009; AU 657522 B2 19950316; AU 681784 B2 19970904; AU 693406 B2 19980625; AU 693407 B2 19980625; AU 714216 B2 19991223; DE 69232233 D1 20020110; DE 69232233 T2 20020627; DE 69233362 D1 20040708; DE 69233362 T2 20041014; DE 69233571 D1 20060112; DE 69233571 T2 20060614; DE 69233575 D1 20060119; DE 69233575 T2 20060614; DE 69233576 D1 20060119; DE 69233576 T2 20060614; DE 69233577 D1 20060119; DE 69233577 T2 20060614; DE 69233578 D1 20060119; DE 69233578 T2 20060614; DE 69233580 D1 20060119; DE 69233580 T2 20060614; DE 69233581 D1 20060119; DE 69233581 T2 20060614; DE 69233591 D1 20060202; DE 69233591 T2 20060622; DE 69233603 D1 20060504; DE 69233603 T2 20060810; EP 1111428 A2 20010627; EP 1111428 A3 20030108; EP 1111428 B1 20051214; EP 1111429 A2 20010627; EP 1111429 A3 20030108; EP 1111429 B1 20060308; EP 1111430 A2 20010627; EP 1111430 A3 20030108; EP 1111430 B1 20051228; EP 1111431 A2 20010627; EP 1111431 A3 20030108; EP 1111431 B1 20051214; EP 1111432 A2 20010627; EP 1111432 A3 20030108; EP 1111432 B1 20051214; EP 1111433 A2 20010627; EP 1111433 A3 20030108; EP 1111433 B1 20051214; EP 1111434 A2 20010627; EP 1111434 A3 20030108; EP 1111434 A9 20011219; EP 1111434 B1 20051214; EP 1116980 A2 20010718; EP 1116980 A3 20030108; EP 1116980 B1 20040602; EP 1116981 A2 20010718; EP 1116981 A3 20030108; EP 1116981 B1 20051207; EP 1122578 A2 20010808; EP 1122578 A3 20030108; EP 1122578 B1 20051214; JP 2677295 B2 19971117; KR 970004508 B1 19970328; US 5680253 A 19971021; US 5861964 A 19990119; US 5861989 A 19990119; US 5940195 A 19990817; US 5973837 A 19991026; US 5978111 A 19991102; US 5995250 A 19991130; US 6020984 A 20000201; US 6020999 A 20000201; US 6040929 A 20000321; US 6091544 A 20000718; US 6124955 A 20000926; WO 9217808 A1 19921015

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090326

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080407

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69233580 P 20060119

2005-12-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0532760 P

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-06-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 532760

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB