Global Patent Index - EP 1111629 A3

EP 1111629 A3 2002-09-18 - Inductive component with flexible wiring board winding for high frequency low power switching network sections

Title (en)

Inductive component with flexible wiring board winding for high frequency low power switching network sections

Title (de)

Induktives Bauelement mit Wicklung aus flexibler Leiterplatte für hochfrequente Schaltnetzteile kleiner Leistung

Title (fr)

Composant inductif avec enroulement en panneau à circuit flexible pour alimentation à découpage haute fréquence de faible puissance

Publication

EP 1111629 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00127513 A

Priority

DE 19961536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111629A2] The component has a magnet core (10) and at least one winding (3) on a flexible circuit board (2) enclosing the core at least in sections. The circuit board is wound around the magnet core on a coil body (4). The circuit board is of strip form with inclined conducting tracks (3) and transverse contact lugs (5) with soldering eyes (6) for connecting the conducting tracks to coil body contact pins (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 5/00 (2006.01); H01F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01); H01F 5/003 (2013.01); H01F 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111629 A2 20010627; EP 1111629 A3 20020918; DE 19961536 A1 20010712

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI