Global Patent Index - EP 1111725 A3

EP 1111725 A3 2002-12-11 - Connector for circuit board

Title (en)

Connector for circuit board

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour carte de circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 1111725 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00126346 A

Priority

DE 19960857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111725A2] A plug-in connector has an exposed conductive carrier part (10), one or more surface-mounted contact elements (20) fitted in the exposed conductive carrier part and one or more plug-through mounted contact elements (38) also fitted in the exposed conductive carrier part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/36; H01R 12/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/57 (2011.01); H01R 12/58 (2011.01); H05K 1/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 12/72 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/57 (2013.01); H01R 12/585 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111725 A2 20010627; EP 1111725 A3 20021211; EP 1111725 B1 20040428; CA 2328676 A1 20010616; CA 2328676 C 20040720; CN 1203585 C 20050525; CN 1300117 A 20010620; DE 19960857 A1 20010628; US 2002137370 A1 20020926; US 6544048 B2 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121203

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-08-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006239 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI