Global Patent Index - EP 1111880 A9

EP 1111880 A9 2001-12-12 - Method and apparatus for detecting dual tone alerting signal in telephone systems

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for detecting dual tone alerting signal in telephone systems

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur detektierung von zweiton-Anrufsignalen (DT-AS) in Fernsprechsystemen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la détection de signaux d'appel à deux tonalités (DT-AS) dans des systèmes téléphoniques

Publication

EP 1111880 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00311023 A

Priority

GB 9929277 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1111880A2] The invention relates to packet switched networks, and more particularly to a circuit and a method for clock recovery in cell-relay networks, particularly ATM (Asynchronous Transfer Mode) networks offering constant bit rate services. The multimode clock recovery circuit has an embedded digital phase locked loop including an input circuit capable of generating a phase signal from at least two types of input signal. The phase signal controlling the output of the phase locked loop generates clock signals for the constant bit rate services.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/26 (2006.01); H03L 7/085 (2006.01); H03L 7/099 (2006.01); H03L 7/14 (2006.01); H03L 7/18 (2006.01); H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H03L 7/095 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03L 7/085 (2013.01); H03L 7/0994 (2013.01); H03L 7/146 (2013.01); H03L 7/18 (2013.01); H04J 3/0632 (2013.01); H03L 7/095 (2013.01); H04J 3/0688 (2013.01); H04J 3/0697 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5616 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5652 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1111880 A2 20010627; EP 1111880 A3 20040421; EP 1111880 A9 20011212; EP 1111880 B1 20060322; CA 2327907 A1 20010611; CN 1171432 C 20041013; CN 1300154 A 20010620; GB 2357216 A 20010613; GB 2357216 B 20040512; GB 9929277 D0 20000202; JP 2002016667 A 20020118; JP 3779874 B2 20060531; US 2001033648 A1 20011025; US 6813350 B2 20041102

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR

2005-02-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 1/56 A

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 1/46 B

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZARLINK SEMICONDUCTOR INC.

2001-12-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING DUAL TONE ALERTING SIGNAL IN TELEPHONE SYSTEMS

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI