Global Patent Index - EP 1112400 B1

EP 1112400 B1 2002-09-04 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTIAXIAL STRUCTURE OUT OF MULTIFILAMENT THREADS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTIAXIAL STRUCTURE OUT OF MULTIFILAMENT THREADS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MULTIAXIALGELEGES AUS MULTIFILAMENTFÄDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE STRUCTURE MULTIAXIALE A PARTIR DE FILS MULTIFILAMENTS

Publication

EP 1112400 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99953545 A

Priority

  • DE 9902611 W
  • DE 19839901 A
  • DE 19855941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6668596B1] The invention relates to a method for producing a multiaxial structure out of multifilament threads which are superimposed with different orientations. The threads of the 0° position run in a direction of production and are inserted between the remaining multifilament layers superimposed with different orientations. In addition, the threads of the 0° position are guided in the area located in front of the stitch bonding machine by auxiliary means which ensure the correct superimposition or distribution thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 3/04; D04H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/14 (2006.01); D04B 21/14 (2006.01); D04H 3/002 (2012.01); D04H 3/04 (2012.01); D04H 3/115 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 23/10 (2013.01); D04B 21/165 (2013.01); D04H 3/002 (2013.01); D04H 3/04 (2013.01); D04H 3/115 (2013.01); D10B 2403/02412 (2013.01); D10B 2505/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6668596 B1 20031230; EP 1112400 A1 20010704; EP 1112400 B1 20020904; WO 0014317 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-10-17 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070722

2007-10-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070722

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAERTEX GMBH & CO. KG

2006-03-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAERTEX GMBH & CO. KG

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KARL MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBHGRUENE

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1112400E

2003-07-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KARL MAYER MALIMO TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-07-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MALIMO MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902591 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE