Global Patent Index - EP 1112444 B1

EP 1112444 B1 2002-11-20 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH AT LEAST TWO ROWS OF CYLINDERS ARRANGED IN A V-SHAPE

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH AT LEAST TWO ROWS OF CYLINDERS ARRANGED IN A V-SHAPE

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT WENIGSTENS ZWEI V-FÖRMIG ZUEINANDER ANGEORDNETEN ZYLINDERREIHEN

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE COMPORTANT AU MOINS DEUX RANGEES DE CYLINDRES DISPOSEES EN V

Publication

EP 1112444 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99946017 A

Priority

  • DE 19840658 A
  • EP 9906196 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840658A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine (16, 18, 20), especially an internal combustion engine in a motor vehicle, wherein one row of cylinders (18) is divided up into two cylinder arrangements (30, 32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/22; F01L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2013.01); F02B 75/224 (2013.01); F01L 1/026 (2013.01); F02F 2001/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840658 A1 20000309; EP 1112444 A1 20010704; EP 1112444 B1 20021120; WO 0014393 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903491

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903491 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE