Global Patent Index - EP 1112462 B1

EP 1112462 B1 2003-06-18 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS TURBINE AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS TURBINE AND CORRESPONDING GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER GASTURBINE UND GASTURBINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UNE TURBINE A GAZ ET TURBINE A GAZ CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1112462 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952383 A

Priority

  • DE 9902531 W
  • DE 19839626 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0012940A1] The invention relates to a gas turbine (1) comprising a plurality of hybrid burners (11), each of which has a pilot burner (21) and a main burner (25), wherein a different quantity of fuel (23) is fed to the pilot burner (21) depending on the load of the gas turbine (1). This provides stable operation of the gas turbine (1) during low loads and effectively suppresses combustion vibrations during high loads.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 9/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/343 (2013.01); F23R 3/34 (2013.01); F05B 2260/96 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0012940 A1 20000309; EP 1112462 A1 20010704; EP 1112462 B1 20030618; JP 2002523685 A 20020730; JP 4339519 B2 20091007; US 2001020358 A1 20010913; US 6425239 B2 20020730

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160813

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160813

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160813

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906025

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150818

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150812

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906025 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE