Global Patent Index - EP 1112846 A4

EP 1112846 A4 2001-12-12 - INK-JET RECORDER

Title (en)

INK-JET RECORDER

Title (de)

TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT PAR JET D'ENCRE

Publication

EP 1112846 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99943212 A

Priority

  • JP 9904870 W
  • JP 25783398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1112846A1] The present invention has a head section for printing data by circulating the ink obtained by dispersing a color agent in a solvent through an ink channel, applying a voltage to an ejection electrode and thereby cohering the color agent, and ejecting the color agent and controls dot gradation by cohering a predetermined color agent when the color agent is cohered immediately before the ink is ejected. Thereby, it is possible to provide an ink-jet recorder from which a very reliable and minute print image is obtained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/06; B41J 2/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/06 (2006.01); B41J 2/115 (2006.01); B41J 2/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/205 (2006.01); B41J 2/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/211 (2013.01); B41J 2/06 (2013.01); B41J 2/18 (2013.01); B41J 2002/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1112846 A1 20010704; EP 1112846 A4 20011212; CA 2343162 A1 20000323; JP 2000085131 A 20000328; WO 0015439 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2003-10-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030120

2001-12-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE