Global Patent Index - EP 1112926 A3

EP 1112926 A3 2002-11-06 - Manual control lever for motor boats and sports boats

Title (en)

Manual control lever for motor boats and sports boats

Title (de)

Handhebelsteuerung für Motor- und Sportboote

Title (fr)

Levier de contrôle manuel pour bateaux à moteur et de sport

Publication

EP 1112926 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00128591 A

Priority

DE 19963476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1112926A2] The hand lever control has a hand lever (5), provided with a hand grip (21), which is displaced in at least one function plane for controlling the operation of the motor of the motorboat or speedboat and which is rotated about its axis in both directions against a return spring bias, for controlling maneuvering via an associated rotation sensor (23), coupled to a rudder control (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 21/22; B63H 21/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/213 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1112926 A2 20010704; EP 1112926 A3 20021106; DE 19963476 A1 20010719; US 2001035063 A1 20011101; US 6443083 B2 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI