Global Patent Index - EP 1113068 A3

EP 1113068 A3 2001-12-19 - Granular layered alkali silicate compound

Title (en)

Granular layered alkali silicate compound

Title (de)

Granulares Alkalischichtsilicat-Compound

Title (fr)

Composé de silicate en couches granulaires

Publication

EP 1113068 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00126667 A

Priority

DE 19960744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1113068A2] A granular composition (I), useful as builder and colorant in detergents, comprises a crystalline alkali metal layered silicate, a dye and an additive. Independent claims are also included for: (1) production of (I) by mixing the silicate with the dye, spraying the mixture with the additive and optionally drying the product; and (2) a detergent composition comprising 0.1-80 wt.% (I), 0-92 wt.% cobuilder, 0-37 wt.% surfactant, 0-53 wt.% bleaching agent, 0-30 wt.% of another layered silicate and 0-46 wt.% electrolyte.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/40 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113068 A2 20010704; EP 1113068 A3 20011219; EP 1113068 A9 20011205; DE 19960744 A1 20010705; JP 2001187897 A 20010710; JP 4126330 B2 20080730; US 2001009897 A1 20010726; US 6455491 B2 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060707

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI