Global Patent Index - EP 1113068 A9

EP 1113068 A9 2001-12-05 - Granular layered alkali silicate compound

Title (en)

Granular layered alkali silicate compound

Title (de)

Granulares Alkalischichtsilicat-Compound

Title (fr)

Composé de silicate en couches granulaires

Publication

EP 1113068 A9 (DE)

Application

EP 00126667 A

Priority

DE 19960744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1113068A2] A granular composition (I), useful as builder and colorant in detergents, comprises a crystalline alkali metal layered silicate, a dye and an additive. Independent claims are also included for: (1) production of (I) by mixing the silicate with the dye, spraying the mixture with the additive and optionally drying the product; and (2) a detergent composition comprising 0.1-80 wt.% (I), 0-92 wt.% cobuilder, 0-37 wt.% surfactant, 0-53 wt.% bleaching agent, 0-30 wt.% of another layered silicate and 0-46 wt.% electrolyte.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/40 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 3/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113068 A2 20010704; EP 1113068 A3 20011219; EP 1113068 A9 20011205; DE 19960744 A1 20010705; JP 2001187897 A 20010710; JP 4126330 B2 20080730; US 2001009897 A1 20010726; US 6455491 B2 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060707

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI