Global Patent Index - EP 1113101 A3

EP 1113101 A3 2002-11-27 - Domestic appliance

Title (en)

Domestic appliance

Title (de)

Haushaltgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil domestique

Publication

EP 1113101 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00124849 A

Priority

DE 19959680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19959680A1] A domestic apparatus with at least one plastic component that is resistant to water and steam is described. The plastic is at least one recycled plastic which contains an additive improving its resistance to water and steam. The additive is an additive improving the resistance to washing or cleaning lye or an additional additive improving the resistance to washing or cleaning lye is present. The additive is a stabilizer improving the ability of the plastic to be processed and the aging resistance or the stabilizer improving the aging resistance is buried as an additive to the plastic component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/00; A47L 15/42; D06F 58/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/12 (2013.01); D06F 39/005 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0077 (2013.01); H01H 2221/026 (2013.01); H01H 2221/03 (2013.01); H01H 2221/044 (2013.01); H01H 2221/064 (2013.01); H01H 2229/018 (2013.01); H01H 2229/064 (2013.01); H01H 2231/012 (2013.01); H01H 2233/036 (2013.01); H01H 2239/072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113101 A2 20010704; EP 1113101 A3 20021127; DE 19959680 A1 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100601

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06F 39/00 A, 7A 47L 15/42 B, 7D 06F 58/20 B

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI