Global Patent Index - EP 1113108 A3

EP 1113108 A3 2002-09-11 - Installation for impregnating moving webs

Title (en)

Installation for impregnating moving webs

Title (de)

Anlage zum Imprägnieren von durlaufenden Bahnen

Title (fr)

Installation d'imprégnation de bandes en défilement

Publication

EP 1113108 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00122428 A

Priority

DE 19963151 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1113108A2] The assembly for the impregnation of running webs, and especially of paper or cardboard with a liquid resin solution, has a steamer (5) between the immersion stage (3) and the heating stage (6), with a unit (21) to blow steam at the rear side of the web (1). A doctor (17) or a pressure roller act on the leading side of the web (1) between the immersion stage (3) and the steamer (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/40; B05C 9/14; B05D 3/04; B05D 3/12; D21H 23/70; D21H 25/04; D21H 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113108 A2 20010704; EP 1113108 A3 20020911; DE 19963151 A1 20010705; US 2001038888 A1 20011108

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21H 23/40 A, 7D 21H 23/70 B, 7D 21H 25/04 B, 7D 21H 25/06 B, 7B 05C 9/14 B, 7B 05D 3/04 B, 7B 05D 3/12 B

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI