Global Patent Index - EP 1113120 A3

EP 1113120 A3 2003-06-25 - Shading device

Title (en)

Shading device

Title (de)

Beschattungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ombrage

Publication

EP 1113120 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00127761 A

Priority

DE 19963862 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1113120A2] The device (1) has a fixed rotatably-mounted roller shaft (4) with a shade (12) fixed at one edge to the roller shaft and connected at the other edge to a leading rail (5). At least one guide rail (2,3) for the leading rail projects from the roller shaft. A drive unit for the roller shaft operates the shaft in at least one direction. A drive unit (16) for the leading rail moves it along the guide rails in at least one direction. At least one of the drive units can be operated voluntarily. A brake unit for the roller shaft can be used to prevent the shaft from rotating. A brake unit for the leading rail can be used to prevent the leading rail from moving.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06; E06B 9/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0607 (2013.01); E04F 10/0648 (2013.01); E04F 10/0655 (2013.01); E04F 10/0659 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1113120 A2 20010704; EP 1113120 A3 20030625; DE 19963862 A1 20010726; DE 19963862 C2 20030814

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 10/06 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/60 B

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MHZ SONNENSCHUTZTECHNIK GMBH

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI